E | 05/15/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/15/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1929 | |
E | 05/04/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1597 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3066 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1572 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1543 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1501 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2716 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Record vote | RV#878 | Journal Page: 2715 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2715 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2715 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2494 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2494 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3607 | Journal Page: 2494 |
House | 04/28/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2468 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 1706 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1706 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1635 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1042 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1022 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1022 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1022 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1022 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1022 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1022 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 852 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 850 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1706 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 470 | |
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |