Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1730 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 31, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 27, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 6, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 7, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 7, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 31, 2023