Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1741 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 23, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 2, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 30, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 12, 2023
Bill May 5, 2023
Bill May 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 12, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 2, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 29, 2023
Fiscal Note March 23, 2023