LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1817
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1817
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1817
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/17/2023
9:00 am
State Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
Senate Chamber
SB569
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB815
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB1817
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: May 4 2023 8:56PM
SB1884
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 H Left pending in committee
SB2146
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: May 6 2023 3:49PM
SB2509
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Referred to Business & Industry: Apr 27 2023 6:39PM
SB2208
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar