E | 05/19/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/19/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
E | 05/09/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1697 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3710 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1663 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1633 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3259 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3253 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Record vote | RV#1176 | Journal Page: 3259 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3259 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3259 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3231 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3231 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3362 | Journal Page: 3231 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3211 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 1788 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1788 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1633 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Record vote | RV#1176 | Journal Page: 3259 |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3259 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3259 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 996 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 996 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 996 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Amendment fails of adoption | Journal Page: 995 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Gutierrez | Journal Page: 995 |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 995 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 995 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 957 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1788 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 496 | |
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |