Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1852 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/08/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1852


 AN ACT
 relating to active shooter training for peace officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1701.253, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (q) to read as follows:
 (q)  As part of the minimum curriculum requirements, the
 commission shall require an officer to complete a training program
 of not less than 16 hours on responding to an active shooter as
 developed by the Advanced Law Enforcement Rapid Response Training
 Center at Texas State University--San Marcos. An officer shall
 complete the program not later than the last day of the first full
 continuing education training period that begins on or after the
 date the officer is licensed under this chapter unless the officer
 completes the program as part of the officer's basic training
 course. Completion of a training program under this subsection
 satisfies any other requirement, other than a continuing education
 requirement under Section 1701.3525, for the officer to complete a
 training program on responding to active shootings, including under
 Section 37.0812(a), Education Code.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter H, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1701.3525 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.3525.  ACTIVE SHOOTER RESPONSE TRAINING REQUIRED
 FOR OFFICERS. (a) As part of the continuing education programs
 under Section 1701.351(a), an officer must complete not less than
 16 hours of training on responding to an active shooter as developed
 by the Advanced Law Enforcement Rapid Response Training Center at
 Texas State University--San Marcos.
 (b)  The exemptions under Sections 1701.351(b), (c), and (d)
 do not apply to the training required by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement shall adopt
 rules to implement Sections 1701.253(q) and 1701.3525, Occupations
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  The minimum curriculum requirements under
 Section 1701.253(q), Occupations Code, as added by this Act, apply
 only to an officer who first begins to satisfy those requirements on
 or after January 1, 2024.
 SECTION 5.  Section 1701.3525, Occupations Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only with respect to a 24-month continuing
 education training unit that begins on or after the effective date
 of this Act. A training unit that begins before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the training
 unit began, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1852 passed the Senate on
 April 17, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1852 passed the House on
 May 6, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 133, Nays 1, two present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor