LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB23
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB23
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB23
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
05/02/2023
10:30 am
Criminal Jurisprudence Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.016
SB23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Left pending in committee
SB338
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB402
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB947
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1518
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1653
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1717
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HJR99
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3197
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
03/23/2023
9:00 am
State Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
Senate Chamber
SB12
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1927
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
SB1092
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/06/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
SB1909
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Referred to Elections: Apr 12 2023 12:21PM
SB1910
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
SB2087
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
SB20
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 17 2023 1:42PM
SB21
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
SB23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Left pending in committee
SB1601
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 17 2023 1:42PM
SB1575
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H Received from the Senate
SB1373
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1649
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 21 2023 10:27AM