E | 05/15/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/15/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1929 | |
E | 05/04/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1597 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3066 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1535 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1491 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 2789 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1488 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 1488 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read | Journal Page: 1487 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1487 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 1037 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Record vote | RV#256 | Journal Page: 1565 |
House | 04/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1565 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1565 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 1503 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Amended | 1-Howard | Journal Page: 1503 |
House | 04/17/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1503 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 112 | Journal Page: 1503 |
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 981 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 981 | |
House | 03/28/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 922 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 638 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 623 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 623 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 623 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 623 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 622 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 622 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 622 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 616 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 579 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 508 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 379 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 166 | |
Senate | 11/16/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/16/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |