Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB240 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 11, 2023
Bill November 16, 2022
Bill November 16, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 16, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 20, 2023
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis May 25, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023
Analysis March 11, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 16, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023