LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB242
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB242
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB242
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/13/2023
9:30 am
State Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
Senate Chamber
SB1367
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
SB2171
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1932
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB242
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
SB1034
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB1322
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23