House | 04/27/2023 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 2333 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2333 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2191 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1311 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1276 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1276 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1276 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1276 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1276 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1237 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1042 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2333 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 609 | |
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |