Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2509 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 14, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 18, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill April 18, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 14, 2023