LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB2606
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB2606
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB2606
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
05/10/2023
8:30 am
Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.012
SB2606
Introduced
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Left pending in committee
HB1034
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1615
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1689
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
HB1950
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
HB2353
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB2416
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
HB2497
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately