E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5894
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3011
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3011
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3011
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3011
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2574
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5193
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2045
|
Journal Page: 5192
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5192
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5192
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Leo-Wilson
|
Journal Page: 5190
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5190
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5119
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Spiller
|
Journal Page: 5119
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5119
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 4312
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 4312
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4047
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1773
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1773
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1773
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1773
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1773
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1773
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1609
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1396
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1396
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Permission to introduce
|
|
Journal Page: 1396
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|