Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2620 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/27/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2620


 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing certain political subdivisions to change
 the date on which their general election for officers is held.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.0052, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a municipality,
 independent school district, or hospital district wholly or partly
 located in a county with a population of more than 19,900 and less
 than 20,000 that holds its general election for officers on a date
 other than the November uniform election date may change the date on
 which it holds its general election for officers to the November
 uniform election date.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2620 passed the Senate on
 May 11, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 26, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2620 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 24, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 138,
 Nays 4, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor