E
|
06/16/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4980
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2291
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4832
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4326
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1717
|
Journal Page: 4326
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4326
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4326
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4248
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4248
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3211
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1729
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1083
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1050
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1050
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1050
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1050
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1050
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1050
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1039
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 169
|
Senate
|
12/07/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2022
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|