Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB267 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 31, 2023
Bill December 7, 2022
Bill December 7, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 5, 2023
Analysis May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 17, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis May 30, 2023
Bill May 20, 2023
Bill May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 30, 2023
Analysis May 4, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note April 14, 2023
Fiscal Note April 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023