Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB267 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 267
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to law enforcement agency accreditation, including a grant
66 program to assist agencies in becoming accredited.
77 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
88 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 403, Government Code, is
99 amended by adding Section 403.0302 to read as follows:
1010 Sec. 403.0302. LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY ACCREDITATION GRANT
1111 PROGRAM. (a) In this section, "law enforcement agency" has the
1212 meaning assigned by Section 1701.165, Occupations Code.
1313 (b) The comptroller shall establish and administer a grant
1414 program to provide financial assistance for purposes of becoming
1515 accredited as required by the rules adopted under Section 1701.165,
1616 Occupations Code, to each law enforcement agency that employs fewer
1717 than 250 peace officers.
1818 (c) To be eligible to receive a grant under this section, a
1919 law enforcement agency must have executed a contract with an
2020 accrediting entity described by Section 1701.165(b), Occupations
2121 Code, and complete an initial assessment by the accrediting entity.
2222 (d) Based on the results of the initial assessment completed
2323 under Subsection (c), a law enforcement agency may request grant
2424 funds for reimbursement of an accreditation fee, staff overtime, or
2525 temporary staffing necessary to become accredited.
2626 (e) Grant money provided under this section may only be used
2727 by a law enforcement agency for the purposes of becoming
2828 accredited. A law enforcement agency may not receive more than one
2929 grant under this section.
3030 (f) The amount of a grant awarded under this section may not
3131 exceed $30,000.
3232 (g) The comptroller shall establish:
3333 (1) eligibility criteria for grant applicants;
3434 (2) grant application procedures;
3535 (3) guidelines relating to grant amounts;
3636 (4) procedures for evaluating grant applications,
3737 including prioritizing applications from law enforcement agencies
3838 employing fewer than 100 peace officers;
3939 (5) procedures for monitoring the use of a grant
4040 awarded under the program and ensuring compliance with any
4141 conditions of a grant; and
4242 (6) procedures for revoking a grant awarded under the
4343 program if the law enforcement agency is not accredited within the
4444 period specified by the rules adopted under Section 1701.165,
4545 Occupations Code.
4646 (h) Not later than December 1 of each year, the comptroller
4747 shall submit to the Legislative Budget Board a report that provides
4848 the following information for the preceding state fiscal year:
4949 (1) the name of each law enforcement agency that
5050 applied for a grant under this section; and
5151 (2) the amount of money distributed to each law
5252 enforcement agency that received a grant under this section.
5353 (i) The comptroller may use any revenue available for
5454 purposes of this section.
5555 (j) Notwithstanding any other law or rule, beginning
5656 September 1, 2029, a law enforcement agency must be accredited as
5757 provided by the rules adopted under Section 1701.165, Occupations
5858 Code, to be eligible to receive any grant supporting law
5959 enforcement operations or equipment acquisition administered by
6060 the comptroller other than a grant under this section.
6161 SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
6262 amended by adding Section 1701.165 to read as follows:
6363 Sec. 1701.165. LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY ACCREDITATION. (a)
6464 In this section, "law enforcement agency" means:
6565 (1) a law enforcement agency that employs at least 20
6666 peace officers described by Article 2.12(1), (3), (4), (8), or
6767 (10), Code of Criminal Procedure, to answer emergency calls for
6868 service or conduct patrol operations, traffic enforcement, or
6969 criminal investigations; or
7070 (2) a school district police department.
7171 (b) The commission shall adopt rules requiring each law
7272 enforcement agency to become accredited and maintain
7373 accreditation:
7474 (1) through the Texas Police Chiefs Association Law
7575 Enforcement Agency Best Practices Accreditation Program;
7676 (2) by the Commission on Accreditation for Law
7777 Enforcement Agencies, Inc.;
7878 (3) by the International Association of Campus Law
7979 Enforcement Administrators;
8080 (4) by an accreditation program developed by the
8181 Sheriffs' Association of Texas; or
8282 (5) by an association or organization designated by
8383 the commission as provided by Subsection (e).
8484 (c) The rules adopted under Subsection (b) must require a
8585 law enforcement agency that is not already accredited to:
8686 (1) execute a contract with an approved accrediting
8787 entity not later than September 1, 2027; and
8888 (2) become accredited not later than September 1,
8989 2029.
9090 (d) The commission shall implement a program to assist law
9191 enforcement agencies in becoming accredited as required by the
9292 rules adopted under Subsection (b).
9393 (e) The commission shall periodically review associations
9494 and organizations that establish standards of practice for law
9595 enforcement agencies and that offer accreditation to agencies that
9696 meet those standards. On a majority vote of the commission that
9797 accreditation of law enforcement agencies in this state by an
9898 association or organization would benefit public safety, the
9999 commission may designate the association or organization as an
100100 accrediting entity for purposes of Subsection (b)(5).
101101 (f) A law enforcement agency shall annually report the
102102 agency's accreditation status, including the applicable
103103 accrediting entity described by Subsection (b), to the commission.
104104 (g) The commission shall post on the commission's Internet
105105 website a list of all law enforcement agencies that are currently
106106 accredited or under contract with an accrediting entity as
107107 described by Subsection (b).
108108 SECTION 3. (a) Not later than December 1, 2023, the Texas
109109 Commission on Law Enforcement shall adopt the rules required by
110110 Section 1701.165, Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
111111 (b) Not later than January 1, 2024, the comptroller shall
112112 establish the grant program required by Section 403.0302,
113113 Government Code, as added by this Act.
114114 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
115115 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
116116 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
117117 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
118118 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
119119 ______________________________ ______________________________
120120 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
121121 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 267 passed the Senate on
122122 April 19, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that
123123 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 19, 2023, by the
124124 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
125125 ______________________________
126126 Secretary of the Senate
127127 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 267 passed the House, with
128128 amendment, on May 16, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 136,
129129 Nays 5, one present not voting.
130130 ______________________________
131131 Chief Clerk of the House
132132 Approved:
133133 ______________________________
134134 Date
135135 ______________________________
136136 Governor