LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB357
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB357
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB357
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/08/2023
9:00 am
Education Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.028
SB68
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
SB133
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
SB294
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
SB357
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select: May 12 2023 12:02AM
SB629
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
SB798
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB891
Introduced
Last Action: 03/08/2023 S Left pending in committee