E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/25/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5615
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2712
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2394
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4840
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1916
|
Journal Page: 4840
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4840
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4840
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4840
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1858
|
Journal Page: 4658
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4658
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4658
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 4322
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3859
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred to Redistricting
|
|
Journal Page: 1444
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1444
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1916
|
Journal Page: 4840
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4840
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4658
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Statement(s) submitted
|
|
Journal Page: 720
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 720
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 720
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 719
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 719
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Ordered not printed
|
|
Journal Page: 586
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Printing rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 586
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 618
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1444
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
Referred to Redistricting, Special
|
|
Journal Page: 27
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|