Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB375 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 16, 2023
Bill January 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Analysis May 9, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis May 29, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 29, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note March 3, 2023