Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB509 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/21/2023 8:30 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Introduced
Last Action: 03/21/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/21/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/14/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 03/21/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/03/2023 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 3 2023 2:31PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 H Postponed