Senate | 04/18/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1042 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 848 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 848 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 148 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 148 | |
Senate | 11/14/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |