Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB51 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Zaffirini, Hinojosa, Miles S.B. No. 51
22 (In the Senate - Filed November 14, 2022; February 15, 2023,
33 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
44 Services; April 18, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
55 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
66 April 18, 2023, sent to printer.)
77 Click here to see the committee vote
88 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 51 By: Hughes
99
1010
1111 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1212 AN ACT
1313 relating to health benefit coverage for hearing aids for children
1414 and adults.
1515 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1616 SECTION 1. Chapter 1365, Insurance Code, is amended by
1717 designating Sections 1365.001 through 1365.004 as Subchapter A and
1818 adding a subchapter heading to read as follows:
1919 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
2020 SECTION 2. Sections 1365.001 and 1365.002, Insurance Code,
2121 are amended to read as follows:
2222 Sec. 1365.001. APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER [CHAPTER]. This
2323 subchapter [chapter] applies only to a group health benefit plan
2424 that provides hospital and medical coverage on an expense-incurred,
2525 service, or prepaid basis, including a group policy, contract, or
2626 plan that is offered in this state by:
2727 (1) an insurer;
2828 (2) a group hospital service corporation operating
2929 under Chapter 842; or
3030 (3) a health maintenance organization operating under
3131 Chapter 843.
3232 Sec. 1365.002. APPLICABILITY OF GENERAL PROVISIONS OF OTHER
3333 LAW. The provisions of Chapter 1201, including provisions relating
3434 to the applicability, purpose, and enforcement of that chapter,
3535 construction of policies under that chapter, rulemaking under that
3636 chapter, and definitions of terms applicable in that chapter, apply
3737 to this subchapter [chapter].
3838 SECTION 3. Chapter 1365, Insurance Code, is amended by
3939 adding Subchapter B to read as follows:
4040 SUBCHAPTER B. HEARING AID COVERAGE
4141 Sec. 1365.051. APPLICABILITY. (a) This subchapter applies
4242 only to a health benefit plan that provides benefits for medical or
4343 surgical expenses incurred as a result of a health condition,
4444 accident, or sickness, including an individual, group, blanket, or
4545 franchise insurance policy or insurance agreement, a group hospital
4646 service contract, or an individual or group evidence of coverage or
4747 similar coverage document that is offered by:
4848 (1) an insurance company;
4949 (2) a group hospital service corporation operating
5050 under Chapter 842;
5151 (3) a health maintenance organization operating under
5252 Chapter 843;
5353 (4) an approved nonprofit health corporation that
5454 holds a certificate of authority under Chapter 844;
5555 (5) a multiple employer welfare arrangement that holds
5656 a certificate of authority under Chapter 846;
5757 (6) a stipulated premium company operating under
5858 Chapter 884;
5959 (7) a fraternal benefit society operating under
6060 Chapter 885;
6161 (8) a Lloyd's plan operating under Chapter 941; or
6262 (9) an exchange operating under Chapter 942.
6363 (b) This subchapter applies to coverage under a group health
6464 benefit plan described by Subsection (a) provided to a resident of
6565 this state, regardless of whether the group policy, agreement, or
6666 contract is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed within or
6767 outside this state.
6868 (c) Notwithstanding any other law, this subchapter applies
6969 to:
7070 (1) a small employer health benefit plan subject to
7171 Chapter 1501, including coverage provided through a health group
7272 cooperative under Subchapter B of that chapter;
7373 (2) a standard health benefit plan issued under
7474 Chapter 1507;
7575 (3) a basic coverage plan under Chapter 1551;
7676 (4) a basic plan under Chapter 1575;
7777 (5) a primary care coverage plan under Chapter 1579;
7878 (6) a plan providing basic coverage under Chapter
7979 1601;
8080 (7) a regional or local health care program operated
8181 under Section 75.104, Health and Safety Code; and
8282 (8) a self-funded health benefit plan sponsored by a
8383 professional employer organization under Chapter 91, Labor Code.
8484 Sec. 1365.052. EXCEPTION. This subchapter does not apply
8585 to:
8686 (1) a plan that provides coverage:
8787 (A) for wages or payments in lieu of wages for a
8888 period during which an employee is absent from work because of
8989 sickness or injury; or
9090 (B) only for hospital expenses; or
9191 (2) the state Medicaid program, including the Medicaid
9292 managed care program operated under Chapter 533, Government Code.
9393 Sec. 1365.053. CHOICE OF HEARING AID. (a) A health benefit
9494 plan that provides coverage for hearing aids may not deny an
9595 enrollee's claim for a hearing aid solely on the basis that the
9696 price of the hearing aid is more than the benefit available under
9797 the health benefit plan.
9898 (b) Notwithstanding Section 1367.253(d), this section
9999 applies to a health benefit plan subject to Subchapter F, Chapter
100100 1367.
101101 (c) Nothing in this section requires a health benefit plan
102102 to pay an enrollee's claim for a hearing aid in an amount that is
103103 more than the benefit available under the health benefit plan.
104104 SECTION 4. This Act applies only to a health benefit plan
105105 that is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after
106106 January 1, 2024.
107107 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
108108 * * * * *