Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB51 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 3, 2023
Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 18, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill April 18, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2023
Fiscal Note April 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023