Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB539 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/19/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/21/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/21/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 05/19/2023 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/19/2023 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/15/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
05/08/2023 9:00 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/15/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
04/11/2023 9:15 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services: May 2 2023 7:57PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/03/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 H Postponed
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/15/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Left pending in committee