E
|
05/24/2023
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
05/24/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2684
|
E
|
05/12/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1859
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4048
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1806
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1806
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1806
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1805
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1644
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3379
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1263
|
Journal Page: 3379
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3379
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3379
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3320
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Darby
|
Journal Page: 3319
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3319
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Postponed
|
5/6/23 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3158
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3158
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 1915
|
Journal Page: 3158
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3345
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1391
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 929
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 887
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 887
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 887
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 887
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 887
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 887
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 887
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 769
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 208
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|