1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 604 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to land services performed by a landman. |
---|
6 | 6 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 7 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 954, Occupations Code, is amended to |
---|
8 | 8 | | read as follows: |
---|
9 | 9 | | CHAPTER 954. LAND SERVICES FOR PETROLEUM, [AND] MINERAL, AND OTHER |
---|
10 | 10 | | ENERGY SOURCES [LAND SERVICES] |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 954.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (1) "Land services": |
---|
13 | 13 | | (A) means the performance or supervision of one |
---|
14 | 14 | | or more of the following activities: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (i) negotiating the acquisition or |
---|
16 | 16 | | divestiture of mineral rights or rights associated with other |
---|
17 | 17 | | energy sources; |
---|
18 | 18 | | (ii) negotiating business agreements or |
---|
19 | 19 | | easements to provide for the exploration for or development of |
---|
20 | 20 | | minerals or other energy sources; |
---|
21 | 21 | | (iii) ascertaining ownership in mineral |
---|
22 | 22 | | rights or rights associated with other energy sources and related |
---|
23 | 23 | | real property through the research of public and private records; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (iv) reviewing the status of title, curing |
---|
25 | 25 | | title defects, providing title due diligence, and otherwise |
---|
26 | 26 | | reducing title risk associated with the ownership, acquisition, or |
---|
27 | 27 | | divestiture of mineral rights, property associated with minerals, |
---|
28 | 28 | | or rights associated with other energy sources, excluding: |
---|
29 | 29 | | (a) administrative functions; |
---|
30 | 30 | | (b) division order functions; and |
---|
31 | 31 | | (c) lease analyst functions; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (v) managing rights or obligations derived |
---|
33 | 33 | | from ownership of interests in minerals or rights associated with |
---|
34 | 34 | | other energy sources; or |
---|
35 | 35 | | (vi) using or pooling mineral interests or |
---|
36 | 36 | | rights associated with other energy sources; and |
---|
37 | 37 | | (B) does not include determining, examining, or |
---|
38 | 38 | | reviewing the status of title in connection with transactions that |
---|
39 | 39 | | are primarily for: |
---|
40 | 40 | | (i) the sale, purchase, or encumbrance of |
---|
41 | 41 | | the surface of the land unassociated with mineral rights or other |
---|
42 | 42 | | energy sources; or |
---|
43 | 43 | | (ii) the mortgage of real property used or |
---|
44 | 44 | | intended to be used primarily for residential purposes. |
---|
45 | 45 | | (2) "Mineral" has the meaning assigned by Section |
---|
46 | 46 | | 75.001, Property Code. The term includes oil, gas, related |
---|
47 | 47 | | hydrocarbons, coal, lignite, uranium, and substances classified as |
---|
48 | 48 | | base, industrial, precious, or strategic minerals. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (3) "Other energy source" means a natural resource |
---|
50 | 50 | | other than a mineral that is necessary to produce energy, including |
---|
51 | 51 | | geothermal, hydroelectric, nuclear, solar, and wind energy. |
---|
52 | 52 | | Sec. 954.002. EXCEPTION TO PRACTICE OF LAW. For the |
---|
53 | 53 | | purposes of the definition in Section 81.101, Government Code, the |
---|
54 | 54 | | "practice of law" does not include engaging in land services [acts |
---|
55 | 55 | | relating to the lease, purchase, sale, or transfer of a mineral or |
---|
56 | 56 | | mining interest in real property or an easement or other interest |
---|
57 | 57 | | associated with a mineral or mining interest in real property] if: |
---|
58 | 58 | | (1) the acts are performed by a person who does not |
---|
59 | 59 | | hold the person out as an attorney licensed to practice law in this |
---|
60 | 60 | | state or in another jurisdiction; and |
---|
61 | 61 | | (2) the person is not a licensed attorney. |
---|
62 | 62 | | SECTION 2. Section 1702.324(a), Occupations Code, is |
---|
63 | 63 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
64 | 64 | | (a) For the purposes of this section, "landman" means an |
---|
65 | 65 | | individual who, in the course and scope of the individual's |
---|
66 | 66 | | business: |
---|
67 | 67 | | (1) acquires, divests, or manages petroleum or mineral |
---|
68 | 68 | | interests; [or] |
---|
69 | 69 | | (2) performs title or contract functions related to |
---|
70 | 70 | | the exploration, exploitation, or disposition of petroleum or |
---|
71 | 71 | | mineral interests; or |
---|
72 | 72 | | (3) otherwise engages in land services as defined by |
---|
73 | 73 | | Section 954.001. |
---|
74 | 74 | | SECTION 3. Section 171.1011(g-11), Tax Code, is amended to |
---|
75 | 75 | | read as follows: |
---|
76 | 76 | | (g-11) A taxable entity that is primarily engaged in the |
---|
77 | 77 | | business of performing landman services shall exclude from its |
---|
78 | 78 | | total revenue, to the extent included under Subsection (c)(1)(A), |
---|
79 | 79 | | (c)(2)(A), or (c)(3), subcontracting payments made by the taxable |
---|
80 | 80 | | entity to nonemployees for the performance of landman services on |
---|
81 | 81 | | behalf of the taxable entity. In this subsection, "landman |
---|
82 | 82 | | services" means: |
---|
83 | 83 | | (1) performing title searches for the purpose of |
---|
84 | 84 | | determining ownership of or curing title defects related to oil, |
---|
85 | 85 | | gas, other energy sources, or other related mineral or petroleum |
---|
86 | 86 | | interests; |
---|
87 | 87 | | (2) negotiating the acquisition or divestiture of |
---|
88 | 88 | | mineral rights for the purpose of the exploration, development, or |
---|
89 | 89 | | production of oil, gas, other energy sources, or other related |
---|
90 | 90 | | mineral or petroleum interests; or |
---|
91 | 91 | | (3) negotiating or managing the negotiation of |
---|
92 | 92 | | contracts or other agreements related to the ownership of mineral |
---|
93 | 93 | | interests for the exploration, exploitation, disposition, |
---|
94 | 94 | | development, or production of oil, gas, other energy sources, or |
---|
95 | 95 | | other related mineral or petroleum interests. |
---|
96 | 96 | | SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act to Section |
---|
97 | 97 | | 171.1011(g-11), Tax Code, applies only to a report originally due |
---|
98 | 98 | | on or after January 1, 2024. |
---|
99 | 99 | | SECTION 5. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this |
---|
100 | 100 | | section, this Act takes effect: |
---|
101 | 101 | | (1) immediately if this Act receives a vote of |
---|
102 | 102 | | two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by |
---|
103 | 103 | | Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution; or |
---|
104 | 104 | | (2) September 1, 2023, if this Act does not receive the |
---|
105 | 105 | | vote necessary for immediate effect. |
---|
106 | 106 | | (b) Section 171.1011(g-11), Tax Code, as amended by this |
---|
107 | 107 | | Act, takes effect January 1, 2024. |
---|
108 | 108 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
109 | 109 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
110 | 110 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 604 passed the Senate on |
---|
111 | 111 | | April 12, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
112 | 112 | | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 11, 2023, by the |
---|
113 | 113 | | following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0. |
---|
114 | 114 | | ______________________________ |
---|
115 | 115 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
116 | 116 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 604 passed the House, with |
---|
117 | 117 | | amendment, on May 8, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 129, |
---|
118 | 118 | | Nays 13, one present not voting. |
---|
119 | 119 | | ______________________________ |
---|
120 | 120 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
121 | 121 | | Approved: |
---|
122 | 122 | | ______________________________ |
---|
123 | 123 | | Date |
---|
124 | 124 | | ______________________________ |
---|
125 | 125 | | Governor |
---|