Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB604 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/11/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 604


 AN ACT
 relating to land services performed by a landman.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 954, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 CHAPTER 954.  LAND SERVICES FOR PETROLEUM, [AND] MINERAL, AND OTHER
 ENERGY SOURCES [LAND SERVICES]
 Sec. 954.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Land services":
 (A)  means the performance or supervision of one
 or more of the following activities:
 (i)  negotiating the acquisition or
 divestiture of mineral rights or rights associated with other
 energy sources;
 (ii)  negotiating business agreements or
 easements to provide for the exploration for or development of
 minerals or other energy sources;
 (iii)  ascertaining ownership in mineral
 rights or rights associated with other energy sources and related
 real property through the research of public and private records;
 (iv)  reviewing the status of title, curing
 title defects, providing title due diligence, and otherwise
 reducing title risk associated with the ownership, acquisition, or
 divestiture of mineral rights, property associated with minerals,
 or rights associated with other energy sources, excluding:
 (a)  administrative functions;
 (b)  division order functions; and
 (c)  lease analyst functions;
 (v)  managing rights or obligations derived
 from ownership of interests in minerals or rights associated with
 other energy sources; or
 (vi)  using or pooling mineral interests or
 rights associated with other energy sources; and
 (B)  does not include determining, examining, or
 reviewing the status of title in connection with transactions that
 are primarily for:
 (i)  the sale, purchase, or encumbrance of
 the surface of the land unassociated with mineral rights or other
 energy sources; or
 (ii)  the mortgage of real property used or
 intended to be used primarily for residential purposes.
 (2)  "Mineral" has the meaning assigned by Section
 75.001, Property Code. The term includes oil, gas, related
 hydrocarbons, coal, lignite, uranium, and substances classified as
 base, industrial, precious, or strategic minerals.
 (3)  "Other energy source" means a natural resource
 other than a mineral that is necessary to produce energy, including
 geothermal, hydroelectric, nuclear, solar, and wind energy.
 Sec. 954.002.  EXCEPTION TO PRACTICE OF LAW. For the
 purposes of the definition in Section 81.101, Government Code, the
 "practice of law" does not include engaging in land services [acts
 relating to the lease, purchase, sale, or transfer of a mineral or
 mining interest in real property or an easement or other interest
 associated with a mineral or mining interest in real property] if:
 (1)  the acts are performed by a person who does not
 hold the person out as an attorney licensed to practice law in this
 state or in another jurisdiction; and
 (2)  the person is not a licensed attorney.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1702.324(a), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  For the purposes of this section, "landman" means an
 individual who, in the course and scope of the individual's
 business:
 (1)  acquires, divests, or manages petroleum or mineral
 interests; [or]
 (2)  performs title or contract functions related to
 the exploration, exploitation, or disposition of petroleum or
 mineral interests; or
 (3)  otherwise engages in land services as defined by
 Section 954.001.
 SECTION 3.  Section 171.1011(g-11), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (g-11)  A taxable entity that is primarily engaged in the
 business of performing landman services shall exclude from its
 total revenue, to the extent included under Subsection (c)(1)(A),
 (c)(2)(A), or (c)(3), subcontracting payments made by the taxable
 entity to nonemployees for the performance of landman services on
 behalf of the taxable entity.  In this subsection, "landman
 services" means:
 (1)  performing title searches for the purpose of
 determining ownership of or curing title defects related to oil,
 gas, other energy sources, or other related mineral or petroleum
 interests;
 (2)  negotiating the acquisition or divestiture of
 mineral rights for the purpose of the exploration, development, or
 production of oil, gas, other energy sources, or other related
 mineral or petroleum interests; or
 (3)  negotiating or managing the negotiation of
 contracts or other agreements related to the ownership of mineral
 interests for the exploration, exploitation, disposition,
 development, or production of oil, gas, other energy sources, or
 other related mineral or petroleum interests.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 171.1011(g-11), Tax Code, applies only to a report originally due
 on or after January 1, 2024.
 SECTION 5.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, this Act takes effect:
 (1)  immediately if this Act receives a vote of
 two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by
 Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution; or
 (2)  September 1, 2023, if this Act does not receive the
 vote necessary for immediate effect.
 (b)  Section 171.1011(g-11), Tax Code, as amended by this
 Act, takes effect January 1, 2024.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 604 passed the Senate on
 April 12, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 11, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 604 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 8, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 129,
 Nays 13, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor