House | 04/27/2023 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 2332 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2332 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2194 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1348 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1184 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 328 | |
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2332 | |
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 278 | |
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |