Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB730 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 3, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 20, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023