Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB730 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2023

                    By: Hinojosa, LaMantia, Perry S.B. No. 730
 (In the Senate - Filed February 7, 2023; March 1, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 20, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 20, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 730 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the granting of privileges to and the authority of
 podiatrists at hospitals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 241.102, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (f) to
 read as follows:
 (c)  An applicant for medical staff membership or privileges
 may not be denied membership or privileges solely on the ground that
 the applicant is a podiatrist rather than a physician.
 (f)  This section does not authorize a podiatrist to practice
 beyond the scope of the podiatrist's license to practice podiatry.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *