House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3345
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 974
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 685
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 669
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 669
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 669
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 669
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 669
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 668
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 668
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hughes
|
Journal Page: 668
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 668
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 668
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 633
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Motion to suspend regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 633
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 582
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 280
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|