Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB747 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 10, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 6, 2023
Analysis May 5, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill March 29, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 22, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 5, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 25, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023
Fiscal Note March 11, 2023