Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB917 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/27/2023 11:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2023 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 14 2023 11:51AM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 21 2023 10:27AM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 12 2023 12:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 25 2023 5:13PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Introduced
Last Action: 02/15/2023 S Referred to Local Government