House | 05/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1924 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1924 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1468 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 960 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 936 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 936 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 936 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 936 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 935 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 935 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 935 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Middleton | Journal Page: 935 |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 935 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 935 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 705 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1924 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 302 | |
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |