Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB930 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 8, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 30, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note March 29, 2023
Fiscal Note March 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 30, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023