LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB979
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB979
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB979
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/27/2023
8:30 am
Education Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.028
SB165
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB979
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Referred to Public Education: May 15 2023 4:58PM
SB2422
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 H Referred to Higher Education: May 17 2023 4:04PM
SB2140
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB2273
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 H Referred to Public Education: May 17 2023 4:04PM
SB2068
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB1148
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 H Referred to Public Education: May 17 2023 4:04PM