E | 06/18/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3310 | |
E | 05/29/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3308 | |
House | 05/26/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5890 | |
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2966 | |
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2543 | |
Senate | 05/23/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2431 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4965 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Record vote | RV#1973 | Journal Page: 4965 |
House | 05/23/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4965 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4965 | |
House | 05/20/2023 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4609 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development | Journal Page: 3064 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2576 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1423 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1423 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1423 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1423 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1310 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 472 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 472 | |
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |