Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR26 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2023
Bill
Analysis

House Committee Report

Witness List
Bill

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill

Senate Committee Report

Witness List
Bill

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2023
Bill
Analysis

Analysis

Analysis July 6, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023