LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SCR38
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SCR38
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SCR38
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/18/2023
2:00 pm
Administration Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
2E.20
HB450
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB485
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
SCR38
Introduced
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Signed by the Governor
SCR36
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 28 2023 2:39PM
SB2333
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23