House
|
05/23/2023
|
Postponed
|
8/18/23 10:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 5116
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 18(a)
|
Journal Page: 5116
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5116
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4998
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1301
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1301
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 846
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 543
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 517
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 517
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 517
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 516
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 517
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 482
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 482
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 476
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 383
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1301
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1301
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|