Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR52 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023
Bill
Analysis
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill
Witness List
Analysis

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2023
Fiscal Note
Bill

Senate Committee Report

Witness List
Bill

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note March 8, 2023