House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1730 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 959 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2465 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2465 | |
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |