Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR70 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2023
Bill
Analysis
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill

Senate Committee Report

Witness List
Analysis
Fiscal Note
Bill

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 12, 2023
Fiscal Note March 31, 2023