Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR70 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/13/2023

                    By: Hughes S.J.R. No. 70
 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2023; March 16, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 13, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 1; April 13, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.J.R. No. 70 By:  Paxton


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment protecting the right of
 parents to raise their children.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article I, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 36 to read as follows:
 Sec. 36.  (a)  A parent has the inherent right to exercise
 care, custody, and control of the parent's child and to make
 decisions for the upbringing of the parent's child, including but
 not limited to decisions regarding the education, moral and
 religious training, and health care of the child.
 (b)  The state or a political subdivision of this state shall
 not interfere with the rights of a parent described by Subsection
 (a) of this section unless the interference is:
 (1)  essential to further a compelling governmental
 interest; and
 (2)  narrowly tailored to accomplish that compelling
 governmental interest.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2023.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition:  "The constitutional amendment establishing parents
 as the primary decision-makers for their children."
 * * * * *