House | 05/04/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3064 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3064 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2192 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1311 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1265 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1265 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1265 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1265 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1264 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1264 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Johnson | Journal Page: 1264 |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1264 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1264 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1264 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1309 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1042 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3064 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 539 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |