Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR82 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2023
Bill
Analysis
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill

Senate Committee Report

Witness List
Analysis
Fiscal Note
Bill

Comm Sub

Bill April 18, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 15, 2023
Analysis March 26, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023