Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate 2023 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR16

Designating November as Ukrainian Genocide Remembrance Month for a 10-year period beginning in 2023.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR17

Urging Congress to propose and submit to the states for ratification the "Keep Nine" amendment to the U.S. Constitution.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR18

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 15, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, February 21, 2023.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR19

In memory of Betty Lou Pendergraft Angelo.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR2

Extending the duty of the comptroller of public accounts under Section 7-c, Article VIII, Texas Constitution, to deposit certain tax revenue to the state highway fund.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR20

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 22, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, February 28, 2023.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR21

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 1, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 6, 2023.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR22

Authorizing the creation and appointment of joint legislative study committees by the lieutenant governor and speaker of the House of Representatives.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR23

Urging the federal government to declare foreign drug cartels as foreign terrorist organizations.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR24

Authorizing the State Preservation Board to approve the construction of a replica of the National Life Monument at the State Capitol Complex.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR25

Expressing opposition to the creation of a central bank digital currency.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR26

Urging Congress to amend federal law to allow states to provide for the consolidation of federally funded workforce development services with federally funded social safety net services.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR27

Urging Congress to Repeal the Windfall Elimination Provision.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR28

Urging Congress to repeal the Government Pension Offset and the Windfall Elimination Provision of the Social Security Act.
TX

Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR29

Declaring an invasion of the State of Texas by transnational cartel terrorists, urging the governor to accelerate the construction of a wall along the Southern Border, and urging Congress to deploy military forces to combat transnational cartels.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records