LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th 3rd C.S.
House
Bills
HB6
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB6
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th 3rd C.S.
Texas House Bill HB6
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
10/25/2023
House Daily Calendar Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
SB7
Enrolled
Last Action: 11/10/2023 E Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
SB4
Enrolled
Last Action: 11/21/2023 E Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
HB6
Engrossed
Last Action: 10/26/2023 S Referred to Finance
HB4
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 11/02/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: Nov 2 2023 9:52AM
10/23/2023
10:00 am
Appropriations Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.030
HB6
Engrossed
Last Action: 10/26/2023 S Referred to Finance